U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00342
  • Case Name: MORTON v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Bill of Costs]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: SS Appeals]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.