U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00510
  • Case Name: MILLER et al v. 3M COMPANY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Confidentiality Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.