U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00026
  • Case Name: BALDWIN v. MERRILL LYNCH PIERCE FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.