U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00290
  • Case Name: FUSCO v. ROGERS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.