U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00029
  • Case Name: OLD TOWN UTILITY & TECHNOLOGY PARK LLC et al v. CONSOLIDATED EDISON SOLUTIONS INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Conference of Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.