U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00274
  • Case Name: GLADU v. MANNING
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Objection]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.