U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00458
  • Case Name: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY v. THERRIEN
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Approval of Settlement]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.