U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00498
  • Case Name: BONSTEIN v. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Objection]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.