U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00064
  • Case Name: GOULET v. WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.