U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00327
  • Case Name: CARSON et al v. MAKIN
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order]
  • May 29, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Approval of Local Rule 56(h) Schedule]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.