U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00496
  • Case Name: LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC v. BROWN et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 21, 2019: [Judgment of Foreclosure]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Bench Trial]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 13, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference & Order]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.