U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00031
  • Case Name: KARAMANOGLU v. TOWN OF YARMOUTH et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Report of Conference of Counsel and Order]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.