U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00114
  • Case Name: WIESNER v. SPENCER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.