U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00056
  • Case Name: VESPER MARITIME LIMITED v. LYMAN MORSE BOATBUILDING INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 08, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference & Order]
  • March 08, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
September, 2019
  • September 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Conference of Counsel]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.