U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00128
  • Case Name: West v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.