U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00069
  • Case Name: HAUSER v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order]
  • June 28, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.