U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00142
  • Case Name: OVERTON v. QED SYSTEMS INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order]
  • July 25, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.