open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maine

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maine
    Case Number:19-20181
    Party Name:Mark D. Sylvester
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Schedules Statements]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Chapter 07/11/13 Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.meb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?96263
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =