U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00164
  • Case Name: SIBLEY v. ADVANCE STORES COMPANY INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.