U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00074
  • Case Name: NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. SPRUCE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Order Authorizing Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335)]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.