U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-20193
  • Case Name: Christine E. Worden
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedules and Statements]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order to Comply]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • April 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.