U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00087
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. TURNER et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Proceed with Foreclosure on Paper Record]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Proceed with Foreclosure on Paper Record]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Order]
  • April 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.