U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00057
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. ANDERSON et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.