U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00090
  • Case Name: WILLETTE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.