U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00108
  • Case Name: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR SOUNDVIEW HOME LOAN TRUST 2006-OPT3 ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006-OPT3 v. KNIGHTS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Report of Conference of Counsel and Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.