U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00151
  • Case Name: JONES v. PORTER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protection from Trial]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order]
  • October 31, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 07, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.