U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00503
  • Case Name: IRISH et al v. FOWLER et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.