U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00202
  • Case Name: YOUNG v. MAINE COAST REGIONAL HEALTH FACILITIES et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Order]
  • November 12, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.