U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00251
  • Case Name: BAKER et al v. GOODMAN et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order of Recusal]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.