U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00220
  • Case Name: PROF-2014-S2 LEGAL TITLE TRUST II BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS LEGAL TITLE TRUSTEE v. SIDELINGER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 04, 2020: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.