U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00152
  • Case Name: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB v. GRIMALDI et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 13, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.