U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00150
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. PELLETIER et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Writ Issued]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Proceed with Foreclosure on Paper Record]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.