U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00065
  • Case Name: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. ANDRY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Judgment of Foreclosure]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.