U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00265
  • Case Name: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS LOCAL 2327 AFL-CIO v. CONSOLIDATED COMMUNICATIONS OF NORTHERN NEW ENGLAND COMPANY LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.