U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00283
  • Case Name: FLANDERS v. ATHENAHEALTH INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.