U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00296
  • Case Name: CONANT et al v. FMC CORPORATION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.