U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00128
  • Case Name: BRADFORD v. AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.