U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00147
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. PINETTE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Judgment of Foreclosure]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Proceed with Foreclosure on Paper Record]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.