U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00287
  • Case Name: HALE v. OWL COMPANIES et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.