U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00317
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA v. GALLANT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Referring Matter for Mediation in the Maine Foreclosure Diversion Program]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order of Recusal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.