U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00207
  • Case Name: PRIME STEAKHOUSE v. MOWI ASA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.