U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00370
  • Case Name: PAQUETTE v. CPC RULE PROGRAM ADMIN et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order for Service]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Service]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Objection]
September, 2019
  • September 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.