U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00389
  • Case Name: LEVESQUE et al v. IBERDROLA SA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Objection]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order]
  • February 19, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Objection]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Conference of Counsel]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order of Recusal]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.