U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00257
  • Case Name: GENERAL DYNAMICS - OTS INC v. WILCOX INDUSTRIES CORPORATION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.