U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00233
  • Case Name: FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION v. CURTIS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Judgment - Default]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.