U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00364
  • Case Name: WVUE 2015-1 v. DOONAN GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.