open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

MAINE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00547
    Party Name:ADAMS v. MAGNUSSON et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoena]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Objection]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Vacate]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.med.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?57627
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =