U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00231
  • Case Name: DALGLISH et al v. ELDREDGE LUMBER AND HARDWARE INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Objection]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • July 09, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.