U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00111
  • Case Name: IN RE: HAYLEY MARITIME INC COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY, as Owner of the F/V HAYLEY ANN
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • July 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.