U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00153
  • Case Name: MCEWEN v. NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order Reopening Case]
  • February 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.